This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/11/2021 at 19:30:31 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Katrina Mayes

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Katrina Mayes. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5864

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Mayes, Katrina

Burleson, TX 76028

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Mayes, Katrina: Returned Unserved 09/22/2021; Returned: 09/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-06616: Conn Appliances Inc.: (48.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 48.75; Total Payments and Credits: 48.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 48.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper