Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/12/2021 at 13:28:37 (UTC).

CONN APPLIANCES INC vs. JUSTIN WOODWARD

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CONN APPLIANCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUSTIN WOODWARD. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0122

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONN APPLIANCES INC

Defendant

WOODWARD, JUSTIN

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mathew Phillip Clark

Defendant Attorney

James B. Heston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $5,488.88; Awarded To: CONN APPLIANCES INC; Awarded Against: JUSTIN WOODWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEmailed: AGREED TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEmailed: CONTINUANCE TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCITATION: WOODWARD, JUSTIN: Served: 12/20/2019; Returned: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06130: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CONN APPLIANCES INC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HESTON, JAMES B