This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/24/2021 at 04:30:41 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Corey W. Paschall

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Corey W Paschall. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9852

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Paschall, Corey W.

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEmailed: NTC OF DENIAL TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAlternative Service Denied: THE REQUEST FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE NEEDS FURTHER INVESTIGATION. ADDITIONAL INFORMATION IS NEEDED TO ASSIST THE COURT IN DETERMINING WHETHER THE ADDRESS PROVIDED IS THE USUAL PLACE OF BUSINESS OR USUAL PLACE OF ABODE OR OTHER PLACE WHERE THE DEFENDANT CAN BE FOUND. RESIDENCY MUST BE ESTABLISHED THROUGH HUMAN CONTACT//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com // 1ST REQ. BY PPS// (DENIED/RESIDENCY NOT ESTABLISHED BY HUMAN CONTACT)// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO ABC FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABC/KAC; Paschall, Corey W.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00840: Conn Appliances Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper