Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/19/2021 at 05:13:24 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Christian Perez

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christian Perez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4020

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Perez, Christian

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Garza

Mathew Phillip Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEmailed: order & reset lttr to pltf's atty & mailed to defn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: from 6/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMotion For Continuance Filed: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: pltf's atty copy of answer & pre-trial lttr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR DEFUALT JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT NIHIL DICIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEmailed: pltf and mailed defn pretrial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Perez, Christian: Served: 04/03/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-1622: Conn Appliances Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: S&A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew P Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Garza