This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/19/2021 at 17:27:32 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Casey Acosta

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Casey Acosta. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5782

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Acosta, Casey

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Wade Stephens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: BY PLTF'S ATTY. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: STATING HE JUST RECIEVED PETITION DUE TO WORKING OUT OF TOWN. ADVISED FOR DEFN TO SUBMIT ANSWER TO COURT. AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: BY PPS SERVED ON 5/15/21 AT 11:18 AM AT 1208 GLENDA DR BEDFORD TX 76022.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Acosta, Casey: Served: 05/15/2021; Returned: 05/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND EMAILED TO PPS FOR SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-02412: Conn Appliances Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens