This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/06/2020 at 07:34:47 (UTC).

CONN APPLIANCES INC vs. CANDE VALLEJO

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CONN APPLIANCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANDE VALLEJO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0125

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONN APPLIANCES INC

Defendant

VALLEJO, CANDE

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Garza

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCITATION: VALLEJO, CANDE: Served: 12/17/2019; Returned: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06130: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CONN APPLIANCES INC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less