This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/10/2022 at 05:29:17 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc. D/B/A Conn's vs. Casey Morgan

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Conn Appliances, Inc D/B/A Conn's filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Casey Morgan. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0313

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc. D/B/A Conn's

4055 Technology Forest Blvd Ste 210

The Woodlands, TX 77381

Defendant

Morgan, Casey

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: RETURN OF SERVICE//EFILED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL TO ABC LEGAL//MLN; Morgan, Casey: Served: 12/11/2021; Returned: 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CITN AND PETN TO PPS//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-01971: Conn Appliances, Inc. D/B/A Conn's: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances, Inc. D/B/A Conn's; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan