Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 21:43:29 (UTC).

Concordia University of Wisconsin, Inc. vs JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Concordia University of Wisconsin, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********08-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Concordia University of Wisconsin, Inc.

Defendants

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s its Registered Agent, C T Corporation System

1999 Bryan St., Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC GOULD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #6: Emailed and or mailed to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index #4: Nonsuit Without Prejudice of Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-167380: Concordia University of Wisconsin, Innc.: (246.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Concordia University of Wisconsin, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 246.00; Total Payments and Credits: 246.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 246.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to attorney office 12/04/2020; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.: Served: 12/15/2020; Returned: 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index #2: Application for Post Judgment Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONCORDIA UNIVERSITY OF WISCONSIN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gould, Eric