This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/11/2021 at 19:30:23 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. PATRICIA A ASHFAQ

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICIA A ASHFAQ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5862

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant

ASHFAQ, PATRICIA A

Fort Worth, TX 76123-2722

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ASHFAQ, PATRICIA A: Served: 10/06/2021; Returned: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-06608: CITIBANK, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss