This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/06/2023 at 15:15:43 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. MARY SEXTON

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY SEXTON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0411

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

SEXTON, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Emerson Mackert

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL RAY DOOLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $14,581.28; Awarded To: CITIBANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: MARY SEXTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: EMAILED BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketMotion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed: PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES/ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial: EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant Answer/ EFILED BY DEFN ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED PPS ON 04/27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: to MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCITATION: SEXTON, MARY: Served: 05/02/2023; Returned: 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2023-02698: CITIBANK, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less