Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 08:40:50 (UTC).

Citibank N.A. vs Martin Garcia

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Citibank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Martin Garcia. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank N.A.

Defendant

Garcia, Martin

Keller, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Crystal Griffin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #6: Emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170080: Citibank N.A.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Citibank N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for abc legal - picked up 03/04; Garcia, Martin: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crystal Griffin