This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/07/2021 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

Citibank, N.a. vs. Marjorie R Kenney

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Citibank, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marjorie R Kenney. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4208

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.a.

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Kenney, Marjorie R

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Sullivan Vernon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON AUGUST 9, 2021, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, DEFENDANT DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Defendant Deceased:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-03180: Citibank, N.a.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Citibank, N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MORGANASSOCIATESTX@ABCLEGAL.COM; Kenney, Marjorie R: Returned Unserved 08/09/2021; Returned: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Vernon