This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/13/2022 at 15:31:17 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. LISETTE LINTAG

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LISETTE LINTAG. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7439

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant

LINTAG, LISETTE

Haslet, TX 76052-1623

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 7.7.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-2795: CITIBANK, N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss