This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/10/2021 at 07:38:09 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. JOANN REYES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOANN REYES. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4301

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant

REYES, JOANN

Arlington, TX 76016-2216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEmailed: ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Order for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: Motion for Alternative Service and Affidavit for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-03417: CITIBANK, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION: PCP; REYES, JOANN: Served: 08/10/2021; Returned: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant