This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/26/2023 at 18:09:01 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. CAMERON PETERMAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAMERON PETERMAN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8896

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

6200 Savoy Dr., Suite 440

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant

PETERMAN, CAMERON

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARYSA POLUNIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNotice: pltf sent notice of hearing to defn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 1.26.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-219: CITIBANK, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: efiletx@ezmessenger.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less