This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/01/2022 at 20:10:51 (UTC).

CINDY MUCHA vs. BEAR CREEK LL, LLC C/O INVESTCORP,BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC,CORPORATION SERVICE D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC.,(NORSTAR) ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 CINDY MUCHA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEAR CREEK LL, LLC C/O INVESTCORP,BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC,CORPORATION SERVICE D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC , NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1197

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUCHA, CINDY

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Defendants

(NORSTAR) ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite #620

Austin, TX 78701

BEAR CREEK LL, LLC C/O INVESTCORP

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC

5400 Renaissance Tower, 1201 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75270

CORPORATION SERVICE D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC.

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

ATTN: CORP. SERVICE COMPANY d/b/a CSC LAWYERS INC.

ATT: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

ATTN: MICHAEL F. ALESSIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GLYNIS ZAVARELLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:05 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : waiting on other defns to be srv'd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketHearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketComments: pltf e-mld court - e-mld small claims packet back to her

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: via e-ml - checking status, e-mld back that motion hearing date & time & copy of answer rec'd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Vacation Filed: **October 19, 2022, through October 24, 2022**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Vacation Filed: Glynis Zavarelli Vacation Notice - SEPT 13 - 23RD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed: Letter to Clerk regarding Defendant's Motions to Conduct Limited Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY LTTR e-mld to pltf's & defn (NORSTAR)'S atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed: Defendant Norstar Accolade Property Management's Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only Filed: via email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: via email - out of co. srv info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-2670: MUCHA, CINDY: (54.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEmailed: receipts on both cases to pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComments: Pltf paid filing fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MUCHA, CINDY; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: **cindy_mucha@msn.com**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: Case was rej'd before an email from the pltf was read - pltf is to pay $54.00 by 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR CREEK LL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEAR CREEEK NORSTAR USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant