This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:08:54 (UTC).

CHUKWUGMEKA ANIGBO vs THE STATE OF TEXAS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CHUKWUGMEKA ANIGBO filed an Other lawsuit against THE STATE OF TEXAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0748

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANIGBO, CHUKWUGMEKA ALEXANDER

Arlington, TX 76013

Respondent

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Amber symone Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketADMIN Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: ADMIN Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; For Tracking Purposes Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketComments: PETITIONER CAME INTO COURT. JUST TOOK TEST ON 2/5/20 AND OCCUPATIONAL LICENSE IS ON THE WAY FROM AUSTIN -HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMonthly Log Sheet Filed by Petitioner - Occupational License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketADMIN Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketADMIN Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComments: PAYS EVERY 6 MONTHS FOR INS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMonthly Log Sheet Filed by Petitioner - Occupational License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06141: ANIGBO; CHUKWUGMEKA; ALEXANDER: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Petitioner ANIGBO, CHUKWUGMEKA ALEXANDER; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComments: PETITIONER IS TAKING A DRIVING/WRITTEN TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOccupational License Granted: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less