Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 08:10:03 (UTC).

Christopher Baugher and Kathryn Baugher vs Scott Gastorf and Lindsey Gastorf

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Christopher Baugher and Kathryn Baugher filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Scott Gastorf and Lindsey Gastorf. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********88-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Baugher, Christopher

Baugher, Kathryn

Christopher, Baugher

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Gastorf, Scott

Grapevine, TX 76051

Gastorf, Lindsey

Grapevine, TX 76051

or wherever he may be found

Grapevine, TX 76051

or wherever she may be found

Grapevine, TX 76051

Gastorf, Lindsay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Pritchard

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY A LACY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171276: Gastorf, Scott: (80.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Gastorf, Scott; Total Financial Assessment: 80.00; Total Payments and Credits: 80.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer & Counterclaim Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation Index # 3:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-169957: Baugher, Christopher: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Baugher, Christopher; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 02/24; Gastorf, Scott: Unserved ; Gastorf, Lindsey: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY A LACY