Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/19/2021 at 22:31:47 (UTC).

Chatham Renovation, LLC vs. Dywaine O'Conner AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Chatham Renovation, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Dywaine O'Conner AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7117

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chatham Renovation, LLC

Defendant

Dywaine O'Conner

Arlington, TX 76014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Eviction Hearing; (10:50 AM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice: Letter to the court filing Nonsuit and proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice and proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXEC'T FEBRUARY 1, 2021 VIA ADULT FEMALE OCCUPANT FOR DYWAINE O'CONNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: Dywaine O'Conner: Served: 02/01/2021; Returned: 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-00741: Chatham Renovation, LLC: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Chatham Renovation, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Verification of Compliance with Section 4024 of the Cares Act and the CDC Issued Federal Eviction Moratorium Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: MISSING NOTICE TO VACATE// **HAS RECEIVED CDC DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chatham Renovation, LLC is a litigant