This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/15/2022 at 11:54:31 (UTC).

Cesar Chavez- Antunez vs Edgar Saul Herrera Sanchez

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Cesar Chavez- Antunez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Edgar Saul Herrera Sanchez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********65-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chavez- Antunez, Cesar

Defendants

Sanchez, Edgar Saul Herrera

Fort Worth, TX 76119

or Wherever He is Found

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Stucky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Edgar Saul Herrera Sanchez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184304: Chavez- Antunez, Cesar: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Chavez- Antunez, Cesar; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 7/26/22; Sanchez, Edgar Saul Herrera: Served: 08/13/2022; Returned: 08/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A Stucky