Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 08:19:13 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Citibank, N.A. vs Timothy A Legendre

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Timothy A Legendre. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********96-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

500 Summit Lake Drive Ste 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Assignee of Citibank, N.A.

500 Summit Lake Drive Ste 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Defendant

Legendre, Timothy A

Keller, TX 76248-8731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan G. Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (Timothy A Legendre)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-169966: Cavalry SPV I, LLC: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCitation: EZ Messenger-mailed to atty 02/24; Legendre, Timothy A: Served: 03/13/2021; Returned: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan G Young