This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/15/2021 at 04:30:09 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. vs. GUILLERMO D TAPIA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUILLERMO D TAPIA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9732

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Po Box 420

Lubbock, TX 79408

Defendant

TAPIA, GUILLERMO D

Fort Worth, TX 76111-4158

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan G. Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: RETURN OF SERVICE//EFLED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EZ/KAC; TAPIA, GUILLERMO D: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO EZ//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00469: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiletx@ezmessenger.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan G Young