This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/12/2019 at 23:19:16 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK vs. BLANCA MELENDEZ,GREGORIO MELENDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLANCA MELENDEZ,GREGORIO MELENDEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7306

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendants

MELENDEZ, BLANCA

Fort Worth, TX 76135-3930

MELENDEZ, GREGORIO

Fort Worth, TX 76135-3930

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Stuart Peterson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $2,812.38; Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: BLANCA MELENDEZ, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Mailed: copy of jgnt to pltf's atty & to defn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • CANCELED: Default Hearing; (3:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Copies/Letter mld to: default hearing lttr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed: affid is missing acct info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed: pulled file and put in default basket/ mf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • CITATION: MELENDEZ, GREGORIO: Served: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; MELENDEZ, GREGORIO: Served: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; MELENDEZ, BLANCA: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): w/business records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP4-2018-5863: ABC LGL: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less