This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/17/2022 at 10:33:14 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a./aadvantage vs. Patricia M Lutz

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N a /aadvantage filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Patricia M Lutz. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7402

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a./aadvantage

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Lutz, Patricia M

Keller, TX 76248-3401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler G. Lansden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. MEDIATION SET FOR 2-10-22 AT 1:30 PM IN HURST/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN IN PERSON. ALONG WITH LIST OF MONTHLY INCOME AND EXPENSES. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM ABC LEGAL/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 12-4-21 AT 11:53 AM BY ABC LEGAL/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Lutz, Patricia M: Served: 12/04/2021; Returned: 12/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05748: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a./aadvantage: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a./aadvantage; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): JAVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler G Lansden