Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/14/2021 at 04:32:41 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./aadvantage vs. Amanda G Malone

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N A /aadvantage filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amanda G Malone. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7555

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./aadvantage

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Malone, Amanda G

Fort Worth, TX 76177-7541

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ana Elizabeth Novak

Defendant Attorney

Richard A Gladstone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer/ EFILED/ DEFNS ATTY/ APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Malone, Amanda G: Served: 03/10/2021; Returned: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01148: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./aadvantage: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A./aadvantage; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: javitchcourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ana E Novak