This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/23/2022 at 10:36:24 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a. vs. Steven D Bell

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven D Bell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7405

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Bell, Steven D

Bedford, TX 76022-6748

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler G. Lansden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $6,085.20; Awarded To: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.; Awarded Against: Steven Bell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF BY SUBMISSION IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,085.20 + 5% INT + CC. COPIES SNET TO BOTH PARTIES. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY VIA EFILE. MOTION INCLUDES CERT. OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS, BUSINESS RECS AFVT, BILL OF SALE & MILITARY AFVT. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: BY PPS SERVED ON 12/1/21 AT 8:33 AM AT 1324 STORM DR BEDFORD TX 76022-6748. AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Bell, Steven D: Served: 12/01/2021; Returned: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05754: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): JAVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler G Lansden