Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/15/2021 at 04:35:52 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. vs. Lekeshia Bryles

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lekeshia Bryles. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7558

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Bryles, Lekeshia

Fort Worth, TX 76118-7755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ana Elizabeth Novak

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Bryles, Lekeshia: Served: 03/23/2021; Returned: 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01151: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: javitchcourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ana E Novak