Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/18/2021 at 08:04:36 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a. vs. David Macias

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Macias. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3678

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Macias, David

Arlington, TX 76010-6791

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saundra Ann Mchone Meyer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $2,133.03; Awarded To: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.; Awarded Against: David Macias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: Plaintiff's Motion to enter default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO JAVTICHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Macias, David: Served: 04/24/2021; Returned: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-01816: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saundra Ann Mchone Meyer