This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/02/2021 at 04:31:27 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Alberta Kossakowski

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alberta Kossakowski. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9945

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Kossakowski, Alberta

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler G. Lansden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $10,224.51; Awarded To: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: Alberta Kossakowski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: EFILED BY PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABC/KAC; Kossakowski, Alberta: Served: 10/22/2021; Returned: 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO ABC FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-01008: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: javitchcourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler G Lansden