This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/26/2023 at 10:17:12 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Tommie Moreland

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tommie Moreland. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9126

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Moreland, Tommie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON JUNE 7, 2023, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, BAD ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Moreland, Tommie: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-05103: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less