This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/07/2023 at 09:01:35 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Patrick A. Mullins

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Patrick A Mullins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9968

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Defendant

Mullins, Patrick A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/19/2023

DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) ()

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCitation Issued:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCITATION: EMAIL TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Mullins, Patrick A.: Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-08721: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketMilitary Unknown

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less