This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/07/2023 at 23:02:29 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association dba as Elan Financial Services vs. Gregorio Ferreiro Pascau

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 U S Bank National Association dba as Elan Financial Services filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gregorio Ferreiro Pascau. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0117

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association dba as Elan Financial Services

Defendant

Pascau, Gregorio Ferreiro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: RESET - PRE-TRIAL | EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 60 Days Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Continued: 06/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: PRE-TRIAL | EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 6/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketEmailed: PLTF'S ATTY AND PPS | COPY OF SERVICE PAPERWORK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: IN PERSON | WAS SERVED WITH A CITATION IN HIS NAME BUT THE PACKET WAS FOR ANOTHER INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-3055: U.S. Bank National Association dba as Elan Financial Services: (34.25)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association dba as Elan Financial Services; Total Financial Assessment: 55.25; Total Payments and Credits: 55.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less