This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 10/05/2023 at 15:12:10 (UTC).

North Mill Equipment Finance LLC, as Grantor, Beneficiary and Servicer of North Mill Credit Trust f/k/a EFS Credit Trust vs AJ's Equipment Service & Rentals LLC and Ana Ramirez

Case Summary

On 06/27/2023 North Mill Equipment Finance LLC, as Grantor, Beneficiary and Servicer of North Mill Credit Trust f/k/a EFS Credit Trust filed an Other lawsuit against AJ's Equipment Service Rentals LLC and Ana Ramirez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********94-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

North Mill Equipment Finance LLC

as Grantor, Beneficiary and Servicer of North Mill Credit Trust f/k/a EFS Credit Trust, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Defendants

AJ's Equipment Service & Rentals LLC

B/S Registered Agent, United States Corporation Agents, Inc.

Ramirez, Ana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ivan Escobar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2023

DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketJudgment - Default Index # 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketPaper Returned Index # 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-194165: North Mill Equipment Finance LLC: (229.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff North Mill Equipment Finance LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketCitation: eServed to Attorney 6/27/2023; AJ's Equipment Service & Rentals LLC: Served: 06/29/2023; Returned: 07/05/2023; Ramirez, Ana: Served: 07/20/2023; Returned: 08/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less