This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/29/2023 at 23:02:22 (UTC).

EDWARD V WENDORF, III vs. MAGGIE ROBERTSON BASS AND STATE FARM INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 EDWARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WENDORF, III. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5675

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENDORF, EDWARD V, III

Defendants

BASS, MAGGIE ROBERTSON

STATE FARM INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jody M. Warner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketOrder of Agreed Dismissal Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketMotion for Agreed Dismissal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Default Hearing; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-05311: STATE FARM INSURANCE: (22.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant STATE FARM INSURANCE; Total Financial Assessment: 22.00; Total Payments and Credits: 22.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 22.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketJury Fees Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketComments: EMAIL PLNT ON BALANCE DUE FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketComments: PLAINTIFF NEEDS TO GET IN CONTACT WITH TRAVIS COUNTY TO PAY FOR SERVICE $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-03392: WENDORF, EDWARD V, III: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff WENDORF, EDWARD V, III; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketMailed Citation to Constable/Sheriff - Out of County Service:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: OUT OF COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: C06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCITATION: BASS, MAGGIE ROBERTSON: Served: 05/16/2023; Returned: 05/17/2023; STATE FARM INSURANCE: Served: 05/19/2023; Returned: 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less