This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/23/2023 at 17:10:06 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Brittany Brown

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brittany Brown. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0988

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Brown, Brittany

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachel M Flores

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/01/2023

DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketNotice of Hearing: PRE TRIAL | EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketAnswer Filed: via e-ml / prose

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketAnswer Due On

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 9/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDEBT CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO SUTTELLANDHAMMERTX@ABCLEGAL.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-5517: Cavalry SPV I, LLC: (35.50)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 56.50; Total Payments and Credits: 56.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 56.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCover Letter Filed: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: suttellandhammerTX@abclegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less