This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/12/2023 at 11:00:13 (UTC).

Capital One N.a. vs. Ariana Haynes

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Capital One N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ariana Haynes. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0725

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One N.a.

Defendant

Haynes, Ariana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linhuyen Thi Pham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $2,365.91; Awarded To: Capital One N.a.; Awarded Against: Ariana Haynes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,365.91 + CC WITH 0% INT. COPIES SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY VIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN IN PERSON. DEFN STATES SHE HAS SET UP A PMT PLAN. CASE TO BE SET FOR TRIAL/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFND - COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): ABC LEGAL/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: RULE 501: POSTED TO DOOR ON 6/27/23@ 1232 PM BY ABC LEGAL/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO PPS FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-02439: Capital One N.a.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Capital One N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Haynes, Ariana: Served: 06/27/2023; Returned: 06/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less