This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/25/2023 at 12:08:16 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs. Christopher Meyer

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 Onemain Financial Group, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher Meyer. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8707

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, Llc

Defendant

Meyer, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harlan Blake Morgan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-03750: Onemain Financial Group, Llc: (38.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 59.00; Total Payments and Credits: 59.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketEmailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Meyer, Christopher: Served: 06/07/2023; Returned: 06/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less