This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/19/2023 at 09:06:08 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. ALEXIS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXIS GARCIA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4858

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

GARCIA, ALEXIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter S. Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketEmailed: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: BY PLTF ATTY//WITHOUT PREJ//SET FOR DWOP 8/18/23//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketNo Further Action Taken By The Court: NOTICE GIVEN VIA EFILE ACCEPTANCE COMMENT/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: 1ST REQ/BY PLTF ATTY/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: DUE TO NON-SERVICE SET FOR 08.18.2023 @1:00 PM EMAILED TO SELECTED PARTIES// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service Filed: TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO PCP// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-03347: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less