This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/29/2023 at 05:01:22 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC vs. NERY RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NERY RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2977

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, NERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023

DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; Judgment of $3,195.03; Awarded To: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC; Awarded Against: NERY RODRIGUEZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: EMAILED PLTF ATTY; MAILED DEFN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketProposed Order: Order for Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: - TO SANDERS FOR SIG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketAnswer Due On

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED PPS ON 10/03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketProposed Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: to mjscourts@abclegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCITATION: RODRIGUEZ, NERY: Served: 10/09/2023; Returned: 10/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2023-10545: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to mjscourts@abclegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less