This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/29/2023 at 16:00:13 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Christie Wells

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christie Wells. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0728

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Wells, Christie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Nicole Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2023

DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $948.18; Awarded To: Lvnv Funding Llc; Awarded Against: Christie Wells

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketCourt Notes: CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF IN THE AMOUNT OF $948.18 + COURT COSTS WITH NO POST JUDGMENT INT. COPIES GIVEN TO BOTH PARTIES/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketComments: AT TIME OF MEDIATION, BOTH PARTIES APPEARED AND AGREED TO MEDIATE/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: FILED WITH DUPLICATE COPY OF DEFN'S ANSWER PREVIOUSLY FILED/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. SET FOR MEDIATION ON 08/10/23 @ 9:00AM IN HURST. MM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN VIA MAIL. NO PHONE NUMBER OR EMAIL ADDRESS PROVIDED. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM ABC LEGAL/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketAnswer Due On: CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCitation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 5-26-23 AT 8:05 PM BY ABC LEGAL/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-02446: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketCITATION: Wells, Christie: Served: 05/26/2023; Returned: 05/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): JAVITCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less