This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/19/2023 at 18:02:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. TAYLOR SAJULGA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAYLOR SAJULGA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0717

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

SAJULGA, TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $2,820.39; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Awarded Against: TAYLOR SAJULGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, $2,820.39 + CC. EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY. SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT FOR PROVE UP REQUEST. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFND - COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): PCP/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: RULE 501 BY PCP ON 7/15/23 @ 507 PM/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. EMAILED TO PCP USA. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PCP USA VIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-02409: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCITATION: SAJULGA, TAYLOR: Served: 07/15/2023; Returned: 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MOSS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less