This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/06/2023 at 14:44:23 (UTC).

Td Bank Usa, N.a. vs. Kelsey Cole

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Td Bank Usa, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kelsey Cole. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9142

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Td Bank Usa, N.a.

Defendant

Cole, Kelsey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $6,508.86; Awarded To: Td Bank Usa, N.a.; Awarded Against: Kelsey Cole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Cole, Kelsey: Served: 05/31/2023; Returned: 05/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-05168: Td Bank Usa, N.a.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Td Bank Usa, N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less