This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 11/13/2023 at 10:00:54 (UTC).

Pawnee Leasing Corporation vs RM Mansory & Stucco, Inc. d/b/a RM Masonry & Stucco, Inc., and Raul Rodriguez Martinez

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Pawnee Leasing Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RM Mansory Stucco, Inc d/b/a RM Masonry Stucco, Inc , and Raul Rodriguez Martinez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********06-3

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pawnee Leasing Corporation

Defendants

Martinez , Raul Rodriguez

RM Mansory & Stucco, Inc.

d/b/a RM Masonry & Stucco, Inc.

B/S Registered Agent, Raul R. Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caleb M. Terrell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2023

DocketWrit of Sequestration: Hold for pickup/Padfield

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCitation: Hold for pickup/Padfield; RM Mansory & Stucco, Inc.: Unserved ; Martinez , Raul Rodriguez: Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-197468: Pawnee Leasing Corporation: (24.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

FinancialTransaction Assessment: 24.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

FinancialCounter: Receipt # CCL-0380507: Padfield & Stout, LLP: (5.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketRequest: Writ and Citation Request Ltr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketBond for Sequestration Index # 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-196877: Pawnee Leasing Corporation: (213.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Pawnee Leasing Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 379.00; Total Payments and Credits: 379.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketOrder Index # 4: Granting Writ of Sequestration / Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketApplication Index # 3: & Affidavit for Writ of Sequestration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less