This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/17/2023 at 21:02:34 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Angela Y Maxwell

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angela Y Maxwell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1846

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Maxwell, Angela Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • DocketDC Court Follow Up: (7:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Docket10 Day Letter Mailed to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Maxwell, Angela Y: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP8-2023-04585: Lvnv Funding Llc: (39.75)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 60.75; Total Payments and Credits: 60.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 60.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less