This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/26/2023 at 19:02:14 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Gary Rogers

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gary Rogers. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0986

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Rogers, Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Burnette Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2023

DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO P ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketAnswer Due On

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 10/10/2023 ALT SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketEmailed: TO PPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketProposed Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: suttellandhammerTX@abclegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDEBT CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO SUTTELLANDHAMMERTX@ABCLEGAL.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-5515: Cavalry SPV I, LLC: (35.50)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 56.50; Total Payments and Credits: 56.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 56.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: suttellandhammerTX@abclegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less