This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/18/2023 at 10:06:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. RAUL RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAUL RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4855

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter S. Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2023
  • DocketDWOP Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: 1ST REQ/ BY PLTF ATTY/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketNo Further Action Taken By The Court: NOTICE GIVEN VIA EFILE ACCEPTANCE COMMENT/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: SET FOR 9/29/23 @ 9AM//EMAILED TO SELECTED PARTIES//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO PCP// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-03344: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less