This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/16/2023 at 14:03:39 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Angela E Danielson

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angela E Danielson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1632

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Danielson, Angela E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Defendant Attorney

Daniel J. Ciment

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/11/2024

DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. MEDIATION IS SET FOR 01/11/24 @ 8:45AM IN HURST. MM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN'S ATTY VIA EFILE. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketLetter Issued: - TO DFND - COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): ABC LEGAL/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketAnswer Due On: TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketCitation Returned: IN PERSON ON 10/3/23 @ 1057AM BY ABC LEGAL.TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-04952: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketCITATION: Danielson, Angela E: Served: 10/03/2023; Returned: 10/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PPS FOR SERVICE/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PORTFOLIO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less