This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/16/2023 at 15:00:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. DENNIS MURR

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENNIS MURR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0132

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

MURR, DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Carlos Goenaga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (5:10 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketEmailed: COPY OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketBad Address Notification Mailed to Plaintiff: E-MLD to pltf's atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: "moved"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-3087: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition with Attachment(s) / efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less