This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/18/2023 at 19:00:59 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Michael Thomas

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Thomas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4853

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Defendant

Thomas, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tarria Simmons Barker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketEmailed: COPY TO SELECTED PARTIES//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $507.59; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Awarded Against: Michael Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 8/15/2023 @ 1PM/EMAILED TO ALL PARTIES//HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: DEFN CALLED AND WANTED TO CONFIRM ANSW WAS RECEIVED/ HE WAS CONCERNED ABOUT STATUS OF DF/ CLK CONFIRMED ANSW WAS RECIEVED AND TO LOOK OUT FOR EMAIL FOR PTM//JA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketNo Further Action Taken By The Court: ANSWER FILED 6/15/23/ CASE TO PROCEED TO PTM//HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF ATTY// TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: ADDED PHONE NUMBER AND E-MAIL FOR DEFN PER ANSWER // TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN PROSE // TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//DG// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL// MDF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-03341: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less