This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/26/2023 at 21:05:20 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc vs. Courtney V. Brown

Case Summary

On 08/16/2023 Jefferson Capital Systems Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Courtney. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2585

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc

Defendant

Brown, Courtney V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linhuyen Thi Pham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2024

DocketDC Set for Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketLetter Issued: LETTER ISSUED TO BOTH PARTIES REG HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketCITATION: Brown, Courtney V.: Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketCitation Issued:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP8-2023-07685: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc: (37.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Jefferson Capital Systems Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 58.00; Total Payments and Credits: 58.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 58.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less